EP0692590 - Elastic floor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYSPORT & ELAKU Sportbaustoffe GmbH Silberburgstrasse 70A 70176 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states POLYSPORT & ELAKU Sportbaustoffe GmbH Silberburgstrasse 70A D-70176 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höss, Klaus-Dieter Albert Grimm-Strasse 18 D-70197 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Berthold Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Schmid, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing. Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95101898.5 | 13.02.1995 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | DE19940011555U | 16.07.1994 Original published format: DE 9411555 U | [1996/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692590 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/22 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
E04F15/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/03] | Title | German: | Elastischer Fussboden | [1996/03] | English: | Elastic floor | [1996/03] | French: | Plancher élastique | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/18] | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2066677 (GREENE P R, et al) [X] 1,4-6 * page 4, line 97 - page 9, line 116; figures 1-10 * [Y] 2,7; | [YA]DE3904223 (OSTERWALD SPORTBODEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,7 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 31; figures 1-6 * [A] 1; | [A]EP0281419 (DAIKEN TRADE & INDUSTRY [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 19 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE2608852 (KLEIN & CO HELLMUTH) [A] 1,8 * page 11, line 9 - page 20, line 10; figures 1-12 * |