EP0683464 - Baton passing optimization scheme for load balancing/configuration planning in a video-on-demand computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shachnai, Hadas 46 Krystal Drive Somers, New York 10589 / US | 02 /
Wolf, Joel Leonard 7 Cherokee Court Goldens Bridge, New York 10526 / US | 03 /
Yu, Philip Shi-lung 18 Stornowaye Chappaqua, New York 10514 / US | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1995/47] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102075.9 | 15.02.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | US19940241087 | 11.05.1994 Original published format: US 241087 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0683464 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0683464 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683464 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, G06F3/06, H04N7/16, G06F17/60 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
H04N7/17336 (EP,US);
G06F17/40 (KR);
Y10S707/99945 (US);
Y10S707/99948 (US)
|
Former IPC [1995/47] | G06F17/60, H04N7/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/47] | Title | German: | Staffelstabübergabe-Optimierungsschema für Belastungsausgleich/Konfigurationsplanung in einem Video-auf-Anfrage-Rechnersystem | [1995/47] | English: | Baton passing optimization scheme for load balancing/configuration planning in a video-on-demand computer system | [1995/47] | French: | Schéma d'optimisation à passage de relais pour l'équilibrage de charge/la planification de configuration dans un système à ordinateur de vidéo à la demande | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - LITTLE T D C ET AL, "Probabilistic assignment of movies to storage devices in a video-on-demand system", PROCEEDINGS OF NETWORK AND OPERATING SYSTEM SUPPORT FOR DIGITAL AUDIO AND VIDEO (NOSSDAV'93), LANCASTER, UK, 3-5 NOV. 1993, ISBN 3-540-58404-8, 1994, BERLIN, SPRINGER-VERLAG, GERMANY, pages 204 - 215, XP000563157 [A] 1,4-7,10 * paragraph [02.2]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph 3, lines 5,6* * page 210, lines 15-35 * * page 212, conjecture 2 * * page 214, line 19 * | [A] - "INTEGRATED DISK MANAGEMENT TO PROVIDE HIGH PERFORMANCE LOGICAL DRIVES FOR MULTIPLE ACCESSES AND LARGE SEQUENTIAL ACCESSES TO A MULTI-DISK STORAGE SUBSYSTEM", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (199306), vol. 36, no. 6A, pages 553 - 555, XP000373091 [A] 1,3,6,9 * page 554, lines 10-34; figure 2 * | [A] - HODGE W ET AL, "Video on demand: architecture, systems, and applications", SMPTE JOURNAL, SEPT. 1993, USA, ISSN 0036-1682, vol. 102, no. 9, pages 791 - 803, XP000195689 [A] 1,6 * abstract * * page 797 * |