EP0669179 - Mechanical shears for hot-cutting of slabs or metal bars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIFRANGI S.p.A. Via Manzoni, 14 I-36065 Mussolente (Vicenza) / IT | [1995/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biasion, Francesco Via Leonardo da Vinci s/n I-36065 Mussolente (Vicenza) / IT | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Bettello, Luigi, et al Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Bettello, Luigi, Dott. Ing., et al Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 95102212.8 | 17.02.1995 | [1995/35] | Priority number, date | IT1994VI00029 | 24.02.1994 Original published format: IT VI940029 | [1995/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669179 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669179 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23D15/04 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
B23D15/12 (EP);
B23D15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | Mechanische Schere zum Warmschneiden von Knüppeln oder Metallstangen | [1995/35] | English: | Mechanical shears for hot-cutting of slabs or metal bars | [1995/35] | French: | Cisaille mécanique pour la coupe à chaud de billettes ou barres métalliques | [1995/35] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 11.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Request for further processing for: | 14.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.10.2002 | GR | 23.10.2002 | IE | 23.10.2002 | NL | 23.10.2002 | DK | 23.01.2003 | PT | 23.01.2003 | SE | 23.01.2003 | LU | 17.02.2003 | BE | 28.02.2003 | CH | 28.02.2003 | LI | 28.02.2003 | MC | 28.02.2003 | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
LU | 17.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
LU | 17.02.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
IE | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 23.10.2002 | |
GR | 23.10.2002 | ||
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 23.10.2002 | |
NL | 23.10.2002 | ||
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 23.10.2002 | |
PT | 23.01.2003 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 23.01.2003 | |
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 23.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR522134 (CONST METALLURG SOC ET) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1550875 (MESTA MACHINE CO) [A] 1,2 * page 5, line 7 - line 18 * * page 18, line 8 - page 22, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]DE7603162U (F. W. ELHAUS KG) [A] 1* page 11, line 15 - line 21; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US4141395 (ARZT ALLAN H) [X] 1,3 * column W *; | [X]US4223707 (JENSEN BRUCE W, et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column W * |