EP0670483 - Liquid mixing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makino, Yoshihiko, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd 3-11-46 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Saito, Yoshio, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd 3-11-46 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Seshimoto, Osamu, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd 3-11-46 Senzui Asaka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102336.5 | 20.02.1995 | [1995/36] | Priority number, date | JP19940028324 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: JP 2832494 | [1995/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0670483 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0670483 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/38, G01N35/10, B01L3/02 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
G01N35/10 (EP,US);
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00237 (EP,US);
G01N2035/1032 (EP,US);
G01N2035/1034 (EP,US);
G01N2035/106 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Mischen von Flüssigkeiten | [1995/36] | English: | Liquid mixing method | [1995/36] | French: | Procédé de mélange de liquides | [1995/36] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/19] | 06.12.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.12.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0299419 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 2-6,17* page 5, lines 12-15 *; | [XY]US4844868 (ROKUGAWA KYUJI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 6-13 * * column 5, lines 7-21 * [Y] 2-6,17; | [Y]EP0527059 (TOA MEDICAL ELECTRONICS [JP]) [Y] 2-6,17 * figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [D]WO9307495 (ALOKA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XY]US5271899 (CARBONARI LARRY A [US]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 28 * [Y] 2-6,17; | [A]WO9325309 (KAARTINEN NIILO [FI]) [A] 2 * claim 1 *; | [AP]EP0607442 (ALOKA CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1,2 * the whole document * |