EP0677602 - Method and apparatus to produce a sliver of fibre material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/19] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pütz, Maximilian Hubertusstrasse 16 D-52494 Hürtgenwald / DE | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1995/42] | Becker, Maria, Dipl.-Phys. Auf dem Haigst 29 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102460.3 | 22.02.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | DE19944412845 | 14.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4412845 | [1995/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677602 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677602 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677602 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/52, D01G23/02, D01G23/06 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
D01G15/52 (EP);
D01G23/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, NL [1995/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Luntenherstellung aus Fasergut | [1995/42] | English: | Method and apparatus to produce a sliver of fibre material | [1995/42] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication d'une mèche de matière fibreuse | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 15.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03113020 ; | [A]JPS61275427 ; | [Y]GB2056513 (TEXTIMA VEB K) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 35 - line 55; figure 3; claims 1,5 *; | [A]DE3315909 (HERGETH HUBERT DIPL ING) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2599053 (TRUETZSCHLER & CO [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 8; figures 2,3; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0347715 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910806), vol. 15, no. 306, Database accession no. (C - 0856), & JP3113020 A 19910514 (NIPPON SPINDLE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870507), vol. 11, no. 139, Database accession no. (C - 420), & JP61275427 A 19861205 (TOYODAAUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |