EP0669782 - Speaker system and its support legs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | [2007/25] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Yoshio 108-6-503 Yokokawa-cho Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hayakawa, Junichi 1-3-11 Mukaibara, Asou-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Ohta, Syuuhei 1-8-408 Tategaoka, 1097 Tatemachi Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Iwakura, Shirou 3-6-6 Zinmyoudai Hamura-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/35] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102687.1 | 24.02.1995 | [1995/35] | Priority number, date | JP19940051078 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: JP 5107894 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0669782 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0669782 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669782 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/02, H04R5/02, G03B21/56, F16M11/20, H04R7/04 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
H04R5/02 (EP,US);
G03B21/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/35] | H04R1/02, H04R5/02, G03B21/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/35] | Title | German: | Lautsprecheranordnung und ihre Stützbeine | [1995/35] | English: | Speaker system and its support legs | [1995/35] | French: | Système de haut-parleur et ses pieds de support | [1995/35] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.02.2008 | FR | 29.02.2008 | [2009/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0435400 ; | [A]JPS6198336 ; | [A]JPH0276400 ; | [Y]US4201449 (CAMPION JOHN S [US], et al) [Y] 23 * abstract *; | [A]EP0260705 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * page 5, column 6 - page 7, column 43; figure - *; | [A]US4868882 (ZIEGENBERG ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 2,12 * column 1, line 55 - column 4, line 18; figure - *; | [XA]US5007707 (BERTAGNI JOSE J [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 60; figures 1-5 * [A] 11; | [XYA]US5025474 (TANAKA TSUNEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,11,14,18,22,24 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 22; figure 3 * [Y] 23 [A] | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920520), vol. 016, no. 215, Database accession no. (E - 1204), & JP04035400 A 19920206 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 11 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860920), vol. 010, no. 278, Database accession no. (P - 499), & JP61098336 A 19860516 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900604), vol. 014, no. 257, Database accession no. (E - 0936), & JP02076400 A 19900315 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |