EP0669507 - Receiver/dryer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hutchinson, Wayne Kevin 205 Victoria Street Ingersoll, Ontario N5C 2N2 / CA | 02 /
Eybergen, William Nicholas R.R. 1 Dutton, Ontario NOL 1JO / CA | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/35] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102782.0 | 27.02.1995 | [1995/35] | Priority number, date | US19940201828 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: US 201828 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0669507 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0669507 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669507 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F25B43/00 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
F25B43/006 (EP,US);
F25B43/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | Sammler/Trockner | [1995/35] | English: | Receiver/dryer | [1995/35] | French: | Réservoir/Déshydrateur | [1995/35] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.02.2000
10.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE Hansa Metallwerke AG Sigmaringer Str. 127 70567 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Ulrich Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.02.2000
Hansa Metallwerke AG Sigmaringer Str. 127 70567 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Ulrich Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 03.04.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.10.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/24] | 08.01.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3606029 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-8,11 * page 11, paragraph L - page 13, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * * figures 25,26 * * page 19, paragraph 2 - page 23, paragraph L; figures 33-45 *; | [A]JPH01215689 ; | [A]DE8136438U (VEREINIGTE ALUMINIUM-WERKE) [A] 1,10,11 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph L; figure - *; | [A]GB2172694 (SANDEN CORP) [A] 5,9 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 14; figure - *; | [A]DE2338125 (VIRGINIA CHEMICALS INC); | [A]DE3936251 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP [JP]); | [A]US4888962 (HARPER HAROLD M [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891124), vol. 013, no. 528, Database accession no. (M - 898), & JP01215689 A 19890829 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * |