EP0681896 - Process for the separation of carpet materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lurgi Zimmer Aktiengesellschaft Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1999/01] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states Zimmer Aktiengesellschaft Borsigallee 1 D-60388 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dilly-Louis, Wolfgang Danziger Strasse 27 D-61169 Friedberg / DE | 02 /
Seelig, Joachim, Dr. Sophienstrasse 26 D-63599 Biebergemünd / DE | 03 /
Wolf, Reinhard Leipziger Strasse 2 D-63517 Rodenbach / DE | [1995/46] | Application number, filing date | 95102872.9 | 01.03.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | DE19944416466 | 10.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4416466 | [1995/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681896 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681896 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/02, B03B9/06, B03B5/32 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
B03B5/32 (EP,US);
B03B5/442 (EP,US);
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0203 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0224 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0231 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0244 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2029/00 (EP,US);
B29K2031/04 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2313/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/46] | Title | German: | Trennverfahren für Teppichböden | [1995/46] | English: | Process for the separation of carpet materials | [1995/46] | French: | Procédé de séparation de matériaux de tapis | [1995/46] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 08.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2301362 (PEGULAN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,8,10-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9401219 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,8,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2416573 (BUCKAU WOLF MASCHF R) [A] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4033701 (MOLKEREI HOYERSWERDA GMBH I A [DE]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 12 * * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2191118 (ANDRITZ AG MASCHF) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]SU1000071 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 01, Database accession no. 84-004345 C01!, & SU1000071 A 19830305 (PENZA PENZKHIMMASH.) [A] 1 * abstract * |