EP0677803 - A method and system for facilitating the selection of icons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grossman, Bertrand M. 235 W. 102 Street, Apt. 3J New York, New York 100025 / US | 02 /
McLean, James Gordon 502 NW 6th Way Boynton Beach, Florida 33426 / US | 03 /
Pickover, Clifford A. 37 Yorkshire Lane Yorktown Heights, New York 10598 / US | 04 /
Schwartz, Michael Stephen 100-3 Asch Loop, Apt. 3F Bronx, New York 10475 / US | 05 /
Winarski, Daniel James 647 South Woodstock Drive Tucson, Arizona 85710-6237 / US | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Rach, Werner, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Rach, Werner, Dr., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1995/48] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1995/42] | Richardt, Markus Albert IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95102882.8 | 01.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | US19940227149 | 13.04.1994 Original published format: US 227149 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677803 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677803 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677803 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023, G06F3/033 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
G06F3/04895 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
Y10S715/977 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/42] | Title | German: | Methode und System zur Erleichterung der Auswahl von Ikonen | [1995/42] | English: | A method and system for facilitating the selection of icons | [1995/42] | French: | Méthode et système pour faciliter la sélection des icônes | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 12.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP01129916.1 / EP1207449 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02281327 ; | [X]EP0464742 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,18-24 * page 2, line 28 - line 30 * * page 3, line 35 - line 46 *; | [X] - "ICON DISPLAY AND SIGNALING METHOD", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19920101), no. 333, page 92, XP000281303 [X] 1-7,18-24 * sentence 4 - sentence 7 * * sentences 17-19 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910205), vol. 015, no. 047, Database accession no. (P - 1162), & JP02281327 A 19901119 (CANON INC) [A] 1,6,18,23 * abstract * | [A] - "INTELLIGENT ICON ARRANGEMENT PROCESS FOR THE DESKTOP ENVIRONMENT", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19940301), vol. 37, no. 3, page 655/656, XP000441623 [A] 1,6,18,23 * the whole document * |