EP0675056 - Hinged-lid box for cigarettes or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | ||
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 D-27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 D-27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Bretthauer, Hans-Jürgen Möckernstrasse 62 D-28201 Bremen / DE | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1995/40] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103034.5 | 03.03.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | DE19944410803 | 30.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4410803 | [1995/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675056 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675056 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
B65D85/1045 (EP,US);
B65D2301/10 (EP,US);
Y10S229/93 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1995/40] | Title | German: | Klappschachtel für Zigaretten oder dergleichen | [1995/40] | English: | Hinged-lid box for cigarettes or the like | [1995/40] | French: | Boîte à couvercle rabattant pour des cigarettes ou similaire | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA1250553 (RONALDS FEDERATED LTD, et al) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2677960 (TABACS & ALLUMETTES IND [FR]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0530651 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 5, line 35 - line 42; figures 6,7,11,12; claims 7,8,11 * |