EP0730152 - Regulating water treatment agent dosage based on operational system stresses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoots, John E. 1430 Lancaster Ave. St. Charles, IL 60174 / US | 02 /
Godfrey, Martin R. 2 S 260 Locust Court Elburn, IL 60119 / US | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1996/51] | Hartmann, Günter, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN BECKER, Patentanwälte, Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/36] | Ruschke, Olaf, et al Ruschke & Partner Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103061.8 | 03.03.1995 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730152 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730152 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730152 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/18, G01N21/64, C02F1/00, C02F1/52, C02F1/68 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
G01N21/643 (EP,US);
C02F1/54 (KR);
B01D21/30 (KR);
G01N33/18 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/008 (EP,US);
Y10T436/117497 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/36] | Title | German: | Regulierung der Wasserbehandlungsmitteldosierung, auf Basis von Betriebssystemspannungen | [1996/36] | English: | Regulating water treatment agent dosage based on operational system stresses | [1996/36] | French: | Régulation du dosage d'un agent de traitement de l'eau basée sur des tensions du système d'exploitation | [2001/51] |
Former [1996/36] | Régulation du dosage d'un agent de traitement basée sur des tensions du système d'exploitation | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 25.06.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0624798 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,7-9,14,18 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - line 54; figure 1 *; | [A]US5132096 (HOOTS JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9,14,18 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 24; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0504520 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,14,18 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 13; figure 1 * | Examination | US4783314 | US4992380 |