EP0671726 - Magnetic disk unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanada, Kazuyoshi 763, Horiyamashita Hadano-shi / JP | 02 /
Kodama, Koji 153-6, Anabe Odawara-shi / JP | 03 /
Amano, Hideaki 145-11, Shimobori Odawara-shi / JP | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103416.4 | 09.03.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | JP19940040728 | 11.03.1994 Original published format: JP 4072894 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0671726 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0671726 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/55, H02K41/035 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
G11B5/5521 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/37] | G11B5/55 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/37] | Title | German: | Magnetische Platteneinheit | [1995/37] | English: | Magnetic disk unit | [1995/37] | French: | Unité de disque magnétique | [1995/37] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 09.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 18.10.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2100051 (PHILIPS NV) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 4, line 54 - line 85; figures 3-6 * * page 6, line 13 - line 52 * [Y] 3; | [Y]WO9210833 (MAXTOR CORP.) [Y] 3 * figures 2-6; claims 8,11 *; | [XY]US5148071 (TAKAHASHI FUMIHIKO) [X] 1,2,4 * column W * [Y] 6-8,11,12; | [Y]EP0550220 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 6-8,11,12 * column 3 - column 5; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US5168185 (UMEHARA TERUO ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column W *; | [A]EP0432877 (SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 35 - line 44; figure 4 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Rectangular Voice Coil Motor Actuator With Flat Coil for Disk Files", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, vol. 28, no. 6, pages 2415 - 2416 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |