EP0673092 - Optically pumped bistable laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeiffer, Thomas, Dr. Lenzkircher Strasse 5 A D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Schätzle, Albin, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Schätzle, Albin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen, Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103621.9 | 14.03.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | DE19944409444 | 19.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4409444 | [1995/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0673092 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0673092 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673092 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H01S3/094, G02F3/02 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
H01S3/067 (EP,US);
H01S3/1022 (EP,US);
G02F3/026 (EP,US);
H01S3/06791 (EP,US);
H01S3/1608 (EP,US);
Y10S372/703 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/38] | Title | German: | Optisch gepumpter bistabiler Laser | [1995/38] | English: | Optically pumped bistable laser | [1995/38] | French: | Laser bistable à pompage optique | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.04.2000 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3440562 (KOESTER CHARLES J) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 66 *; | [X]US5128800 (ZIRNGIBL MARTIN [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 2 * * column 4, line 59 - line 65; figures 7,9 *; | [A]WO9204750 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,5 * page 4, line 14 - line 18 * | [DA] - GREER E J ET AL, "ALL-OPTICAL FM MODE-LOCKING OF FIBRE LASER", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19920827), vol. 28, no. 18, pages 1741 - 1743, XP000309486 [DA] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19921107 |