EP0673823 - Grating for the construction of a conical basket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wanzl GmbH & Co. Entwicklungs-KG Postfach 11 29 D-89336 Leipheim / DE | [1995/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wanzl, Rudolf Sonnenweg 8 D-89340 Leipheim / DE | [1995/39] | Application number, filing date | 95103642.5 | 14.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | DE19944410265 | 24.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4410265 | [1995/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673823 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673823 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/10 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
B62B3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1995/39] | Title | German: | Gitterrost zur Bildung eines konischen Korbes | [1995/39] | English: | Grating for the construction of a conical basket | [1995/39] | French: | Grille pour la construction d'un panier conique | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 06.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0051410 (CLARES EQUIP LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE9305333U (WANZL ENTWICKLUNG GMBH [DE]); | [A]US3751059 (DUNDER D, et al); | [A]US3353836 (DAVIS LYNN N) |