EP0677461 - Accumulating conveyor for articles of all kinds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLUME-ROLLEN GmbH Röntgenstrasse 1-3 D-42477 Radevormwald / DE | [1995/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wünnenberg, Manfred Haus-Endt-Strasse 134 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Mentzel, Norbert, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34 D-42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103827.2 | 16.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | DE19944412493 | 12.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4412493 | [1995/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0677461 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/26, B65G43/10 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
B65G37/02 (EP);
B65G43/10 (EP);
B65G47/261 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, LI, LU, NL [1995/42] | Title | German: | Staugutförderer für Stückgut aller Art | [1995/42] | English: | Accumulating conveyor for articles of all kinds | [1995/42] | French: | Transporteur accumulateur pour toutes sortes d'articles | [1995/42] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 17.04.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0350433 (MANNESMANN AG) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 6; | [X]EP0504654 (TRANSNORM SYSTEM GMBH) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE9106384U (BENDER) [X] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0463878 (XEROX CORP) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [A] 5,6; | [A]US5086910 (TERPSTRA PAUL D) [A] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0066119 (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT GMBH) [A] 1,5,6 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 11; figure 1 * |