EP0672772 - Biologically degradable nonwoven and composite nonwoven materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinkel, Werner-Helmut Maria-Lerch-Weg 5 D-96049 Bamberg / DE | [1995/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/38] | Application number, filing date | 95104000.5 | 17.03.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | DE19944409465 | 19.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4409465 | [1995/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0672772 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0672772 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/42, B32B5/22, A61F13/15, A61L15/16, E02D17/20, A01G13/02 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
D04H1/4266 (EP);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
D04H1/425 (EP);
D04H1/4291 (EP);
D04H1/435 (EP);
D04H1/46 (EP);
D04H1/485 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/38] | D04H1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/38] | Title | German: | Biologisch abbaubare Vliese und Vliesverbundmaterialien | [1995/38] | English: | Biologically degradable nonwoven and composite nonwoven materials | [1995/38] | French: | Non-tissé et matériaux non-tissés composites dégradable biologiquement | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05186623 ; | [A]US4139699 (HERNANDEZ HENRY R, et al) [A] 1 * example 1 *; | [A]US4144079 (SMITH FREDERICK R) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - line 63 *; | [A]US4243480 (HERNANDEZ HENRY R, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO8502422 (AVTEX FIBERS INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 32 - page 37; example 1 * * page 13, line 13 *; | [A]DE4136694 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 35 - line 36 *; | [A]EP0578107 (DIERIG HOLDING AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [PA]WO9409190 (NOVAMONT SPA [IT], et al) [PA] 1* the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 34, Database accession no. 93-269893, XP002086560 & JPH05186623 A 19930727 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |