EP0733667 - Method for preparing an impact-resistant antistatic polyacetal composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöppel, Wolfgang G., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufac. Company, 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul, Minnesota 55 144-1000 / US | 02 /
Gayk, Oliver., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufac. Company, 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul, Minnesota 55 144-1000 / US | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Stefan, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wilhelm, Stefan, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [1996/39] | Wilhelm, Stefan, et al 3M Laboratories (Europe) GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Hansastrasse 9 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104045.0 | 20.03.1995 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733667 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/22, C08K3/04, C08L59/00, C08L75/04, // (C08L59/00, 75:04),(C08L75/04, 59:00) | [1996/39] | CPC: |
C08J3/226 (EP);
C08L59/00 (EP);
C08J2359/02 (EP);
C08J2475/00 (EP);
C08L75/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L59/00, C08L75/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/39] | Title | German: | Methode zur Herstellung einer schlagzähen, antistatischen Polyacetalabmischung | [1996/39] | English: | Method for preparing an impact-resistant antistatic polyacetal composition | [1996/39] | French: | Méthode pour la préparation d'une composition de polyacétal antistatique et résistante aux chocs | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 23.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/42] | 08.06.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPH0680857 ; | [Y]DE1544677 (CELANESE CORP.) [Y] 1-3,5,8 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 10 * * example . *; | [DY]EP0327384 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP.) [DY] 1-3,5-8 * claims 1,2 * * column 2, line 30 - column 11, line 40 *; | [Y]EP0339910 (POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD.) [Y] 1-3,5-8 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 26 * * example 2 *; | [A]WO9113017 (GIGATEK MEMORY SYSTEMS) [A] 10-13 * claims 1-6,34,35 * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940627), vol. 18, no. 337, Database accession no. (C - 1217), & JP06080857 A 19940322 (POLYPLASTICS CO.) [DY] 1-3,5,8 * abstract * |