EP0677731 - Optical sensor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyou-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | ||
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiyomoto, Hironobu, c/o Omron Corp. 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | 02 /
Yasuda, Naru, c/o Omron Corp. 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | 03 /
Ekawa, Kouichi, c/o Omron Corp. 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | 04 /
Hosokawa, Hayami, c/o Omron Corp. 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104081.5 | 20.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | JP19940055426 | 25.03.1994 Original published format: JP 5542694 | JP19940331155 | 08.12.1994 Original published format: JP 33115594 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677731 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677731 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677731 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/21, G02B27/28 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02B27/28 (KR);
B60H1/00785 (EP,US);
B60H3/06 (EP,US);
B60S1/0818 (EP,US);
B60T8/17 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/42] | Title | German: | Optische Sensoranordnung | [1995/42] | English: | Optical sensor device | [1995/42] | French: | Dispositif capteur optique | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 19.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.11.2002 | GB | 20.03.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 20.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0475803 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-7,10,18-27,35,37,38 * column 3, line 22 - line 36 * * column 4, line 19 - line 24 * * figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0361430 (ENVIRONMENTAL PROD [US]) [Y] 24 * column A * * column 10, line 44 - line 53 * * column 13, line 12 - line 33 * * column 14, line 52 - column 15, * * line 26 *; column 19, line 17 - line 20 * * figure 7 * [A] 37,38; | [A]US4482250 (HIRVONEN KULLERVO [FI], et al) [A] 1,3,15,18,22,23 * column A * * column 3, line 7 - line 32 * * column 5, line 5 - line 9 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4844584 (MIYAGAWA ICHIROU [JP]) [A] 1,3,9,18,20,22,23 * column 4, line 11 - line 14 * * figure 8 *; | [A]EP0313682 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,20,22 * page 2, line 39 - line 40 * * page 7, line 45 - line 51 * * figure 9 *; | [A]EP0464556 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 9,12 * column A * * page 3, line 31 - line 38 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4966457 (HAYANO FUMINORI [JP], et al) [A] 13 * column A; figure 2 *; | [PX]EP0601862 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [PX] 1 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, line 10 - line 23 * * figure 25 *; | [Y]US4318003 (ONO YOSHIO, et al) [Y] 25,26 * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 6, line 14 - line 16 * * column 6, line 30 - line 38 * * column 6, line 58 - line 64 * * figure 7 *; | [Y]EP0532344 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 27 * column A * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 7 *; | [Y]US5139339 (COURTNEY JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 27 * column A * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 24 *; | [Y]EP0072236 (DE LA RUE SYST [GB]) [Y] 35 * column A * * page 6, line 1 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0018505 (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]) [A] 35 * page 2, line 9 - line 13 * * page 6, last paragraph - page 7, * * line 3 *; | [Y]US4919534 (REED MICHAEL A [US]) [Y] 37,38 * column A * * column 10, line 21 - line 40 * * column 15, line 20 - line 23 * * figure 7 *; | [A]US3603458 (BLISS GEORGE N) [A] 37,38 * column A * * column 2, line 42 - line 45 * * column 3, line 36 - line 42 * * figure 1 * | [Y] - J.MOUCHART ET AL, "Modified MacNeille cube polarizer for a wide angular field", APPLIED OPTICS, NEW YORK US, (19890715), vol. 28, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.28.002847, pages 2847 - 2853, XP000067191 [Y] 1-7,10,18-27,35,37,38 * abstract * * page 2852, left column, line 8 - right column, last line; figures 14,15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.28.002847 |