EP0678302 - Implantable medication infusion pump with discharge side port [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minimed Inc. 12744 San Fernando Road Sylmar, California 91342 / US | [1995/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Srisathapat, Chad 8701 Vine Valley Drive Sun Valley, CA 91352 / US | 02 /
Indravudh, Virote 28727 Howard Marie Court Saugus, CA 91350 / US | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Ruschke & Partner Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104135.9 | 21.03.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | US19940221569 | 01.04.1994 Original published format: US 221569 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0678302 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0678302 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678302 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
A61M5/14276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/43] | Title | German: | Implantierbare Infusionspumpe mit seitlicher Auslassöffnung | [1995/43] | English: | Implantable medication infusion pump with discharge side port | [1995/43] | French: | Pompe de perfusion implantable avec orifice de sortie latéral | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.02.1999 | IT | 03.02.1999 | LI | 03.02.1999 | NL | 03.02.1999 | SE | 03.02.1999 | DK | 03.05.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
NL | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
DK | 03.05.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
NL | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 03.02.1999 | |
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 10.05.1999 | |
LI | 10.05.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0142866 (CONS CONTROLS CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 20, line 12 - page 21, line 11; figure 14 *; | [A]EP0183351 (FEINGOLD VLADIMIR) [A] 1-12 * page 14, line 29 - page 15, line 24; figures 8,9 *; | [X]USH150H (HANKNER ET AL) [X] 1-12 * column W *; | [A]FR2586569 (AHS FRANCE LABORATOIRES [FR]) [A] 4-7 * page 6, line 13 - line 20; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5109850 (BLANCO ERNESTO E [US], et al) [A] 8,9* column 5, line 9 - line 12; figure 1 * | [A] - BUCHWALD ET AL, "Implantable pumps", ASAIO JOURNAL, HAGERSTOWN,MD US, vol. 38, no. 4, pages 772 - 778 [A] 1-12 * figures 2-4 * |