EP0677708 - Hot water heating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG 6301 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG CH-6301 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seebacher, Theodor Ernst Waidach 148 A-5421 Adnet / AT | 02 /
Merz, Siegfried Im Mattler 3 CH-8911 Rifferswil / CH | 03 /
Wild, Willi Winzrüti 25a CH-6319 Allenwinden / CH | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/41] | Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Hans-Jürgen Müller, Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Gerhard Schupfner, Dipl.-Ing. Hans-Peter Gauger, Postfach 101161 80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104368.6 | 24.03.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | AT19940000745 | 12.04.1994 Original published format: AT 74594 | [1995/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677708 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677708 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
F24D19/1036 (EP,US);
G05D7/0106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, IT, LI, SE [1995/42] | Title | German: | Warmwasserheizung | [1995/42] | English: | Hot water heating | [1995/42] | French: | Chauffage à eau chaude | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 06.03.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/24] | 16.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1253770 (LANDIS & GYR AG) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1803360 (KARLSRUHE AUGSBURG IWEKA) [A] 1* figure -; claim - * |