EP0678668 - Fuel injection device for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/33] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Popp, Heinz Gmundnerstrasse 23 A-4661 Roitham / AT | [1995/43] | Application number, filing date | 95104465.0 | 27.03.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | DE19944414242 | 23.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4414242 | [1995/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0678668 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0678668 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678668 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02M63/02, F02M55/02, F02M59/46 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
F02M63/0295 (EP,KR,US);
F02M63/0017 (EP,KR,US);
F02M55/02 (EP,KR,US);
F02M55/025 (EP,KR,US);
F02M63/0205 (EP,KR,US);
F02M63/0215 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/43] | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1995/43] | English: | Fuel injection device for internal combustion engines | [1995/43] | French: | Dispositif d'injection de combustible pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0531533 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 23 - line 57 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 15 * * column 10, line 51 - column 11, line 1; figures 1,5 * [A] 3,6 [Y] 2; | [YA]US5191867 (GLASSEY STEPHEN F [US]) [Y] 2 * column 15, line 26 - line 52 * * column 17, line 41 - line 68 * * column 19, line 13 - line 23; figures 1,12,13 * [A] 1,7; | [A]GB2263317 (DIESEL TECH CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 29; figure 1 *; | [A]US4704997 (ENDO YASUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,6 * column 2, line 64 - column 5, line 33 * * column 8, line 50 - column 12, line 23; figures 1-4,10,11 *; | [A]FR2125946 (CAV LTD) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2609503 (IVECO FIAT [IT]) [A] 1,7 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]US4539959 (WILLIAMS DONALD L [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0299337 (IVECO FIAT [IT], et al); | [A]EP0459429 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0517991 (MARTIN TIBY M [US]) | by applicant | US4777921 | US5191867 |