EP0683602 - Method and apparatus for a low noise, charge coupled device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA CORPORATION 100 Challenger Road Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Agfa Corporation 100 Challenger Road Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US | ||
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation Agfa Division, 200 Ballardvale Street Wilmington, MA 01887-1069 / US | ||
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states MILES INC. Agfa Division 200 Ballardvale Street Wilmington Massachusetts 01887-1011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pandelaers, Patrick M. 9 Patriot Drive Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
Buyze, Johan S. 5 Cider Mill Road Lynnfield, MA 01940 / US | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Van Ostaeyen, Marc Albert Jozef AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800, Patent Administration, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Van Ostaeyen, Marc Albert Jozef Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Corporate IP Department 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1996/33] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse & Hofstetter, Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/47] | Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104482.5 | 27.03.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | US19940242940 | 16.05.1994 Original published format: US 242940 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683602 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683602 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
H01L27/14831 (EP);
H04N25/622 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1995/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für eine rauscharme ladungsgekoppelte Anordnung | [2000/21] | English: | Method and apparatus for a low noise, charge coupled device | [1995/47] | French: | Procédé et appareillage pour un dispositif à couplage de charges à faible bruit | [1995/47] |
Former [1995/47] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für eine geräuscharme ladungsgekoppelte Anordnung | Examination procedure | 21.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.03.2001 | [2002/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3986198 (KOSONOCKY WALTER FRANK); | [A]EP0033129 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]EP0115225 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]US4620231 (KOSONOCKY WALTER F [US]); | [A]US4912560 (OOSAWA SHINJI [JP], et al); | [DY]US5055667 (SAYAG MICHEL [US]) | by applicant | US4748515 | US5055667 |