EP0679774 - Tilting/oscillating roof window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTO FRANK Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgarter Strasse 145-149 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1999/42] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states ROTO FRANK Aktiengesellschaft Stuttgarter Strasse 145-149 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Karl-Heinz Zeisigweg 30 D-71111 Waldenbuch / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Johann Schreinerstrasse 18 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
Wöhrn, Volker Moltkestrasse 8 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [1999/42] |
Former [1995/44] | 01 /
Frank, Karl-Heinz Zeisigweg 30 D-71111 Waldenbuch / DE | ||
02 /
Schneider, Johann Schreinerstr. 18 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | |||
03 /
Wöhrn, Volker Moltkestr. 8 D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/24] |
Former [1999/21] | Gleiss & Grosse Maybachstrasse 6 A 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95104532.7 | 28.03.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | DE19940006930U | 26.04.1994 Original published format: DE 9406930 U | [1995/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0679774 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0679774 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0679774 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/035, E05D15/48 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
E05D15/48 (EP,US);
E04D13/0357 (EP,US);
E05D2015/487 (EP,US);
E05F1/1075 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, IT [1995/44] | Extension states | SI | 28.03.1995 | Title | German: | Klapp-Schwing-Dachfenster | [1995/44] | English: | Tilting/oscillating roof window | [1995/44] | French: | Fenêtre basculante/oscillante de toiture | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 13.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2414887 (CODE DESIGNS) [A] 1 * page 4 - page 7; figures 1-10 *; | [DA]DE2708785 (STUCKE LOTHAR) [DA] 1* page 7 - page 9; figures 1-5 * |