EP0735206 - Closure device, particularly for drains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISC ITALIANA S.r.l. Via E. Mattei 11 I-35030 Saccolongo (Padova) / IT | [1996/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stampacchia, Marcello Via A. Battistel, 23-E I-31100 Treviso / IT | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95104645.7 | 29.03.1995 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735206 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/23 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
E03C1/23 (EP);
E03C2001/2313 (EP);
E03C2001/2317 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, NL, PT [1996/40] | Title | German: | Verschlussvorrichtung, insbesondere für Abflüsse | [1996/40] | English: | Closure device, particularly for drains | [1996/40] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture, notamment pour conduits d'évacuation | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 28.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/27] | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9116847 (LEWIS) [X] 1,6-8 * page 11, line 26 - page 13, line 15; figures 4,5 *; | [X]FR2391329 (FRIEDRICH GROHE ARMATURENFABRIK G.M.B.H. & CO.) [X] 1,6-8 * page 2, line 8 - line 27; figure . *; | [X]AU6615781D (MCKAY) [X] 1,6-8 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 20; figure - *; | [A]DE4241023 (DEMANDT) [A] 1,6-8 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2064923 (HAZARD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 38 - page 3, line 11; figures 1-3 * |