EP0730319 - An antenna system having a choke reflector for minimizing sideward radiation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACE ANTENNA CORPORATION 329-9, Songnae 1-dong, Sosa-ku Puchun Kyunggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states ACE ANTENNA CORPORATION 329-9, Songnae 1-dong, Sosa-ku Puchun, Kyunggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Jung Kun c/o ACE Antenna Corp., 329-9, Songnae 1-Dong Sosa-ku Puchun, Kyunggi-Do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Yong Hee c/o ACE Antenna Corp., 329-9, Songnae 1-Dong Sosa-ku Puchun, Kyunggi-Do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Jae Ho c/o ACE Antenna Corp., 329-9, Songnae 1-Dong Sosa-ku Puchun, Kyunggi-Do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Jung Sik c/o ACE Antenna Corp., 329-9, Songnae 1-Dong Sosa-ku Puchun, Kyunggi-Do / KR | 05 /
Oh, Byung Ill c/o ACE Antenna Corp., 329-9, Songnae 1-Dong Sosa-ku Puchun, Kyunggi-Do / KR | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter, et al Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Maiwald & Partner, Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105206.7 | 06.04.1995 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | KR19950004409 | 03.03.1995 Original published format: KR 9504409 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730319 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730319 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q19/10, H01Q3/20 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
H01Q19/108 (EP,US);
H01Q3/00 (KR);
H01Q3/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | Antennensystem mit einem Drosselreflektor zur Reduzierung von Seitwärtsstrahlung | [1996/36] | English: | An antenna system having a choke reflector for minimizing sideward radiation | [1996/36] | French: | Système d'antenne avec un réflecteur d'étranglement pour minimiser le rayonnement latéral | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 31.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0174579 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * page 28, line 7 - page 30, line 1 * * page 32, line 2 - page 37, line 20; figures 18-30 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]EP0531979 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1-11; claims 1-23 *; | [A]FR2390027 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1B-D,2A,B; claims 1-9 *; | [A]JPH05291822 ; | [A]EP0186455 (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 5; claims 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940210), vol. 18, no. 84, Database accession no. (E - 1506), & JP05291822 A 19931105 (DENKI KOGYO) [A] 1 * abstract * |