EP0693419 - Multi-speed hub transmission for a bicycle with more than three speeds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1998 [1998/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann Sachs Aktiengesellschaft Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [1998/16] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states FICHTEL & SACHS AG Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 D-97424 Schweinfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergles, Eduard, Ing. Vaterdorfstrasse 42 A-8041 Graz / AT | [1997/47] |
Former [1996/04] | 01 /
Bergles, Eduard Ing. Vaterdorfstr. 42 A-8041 Graz / AT | Application number, filing date | 95105271.1 | 07.04.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | DE19944426239 | 23.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4426239 | [1996/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0693419 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0693419 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693419 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B62M11/16, B62L5/16, F16H3/66 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
B62L5/16 (EP);
B62M11/16 (EP);
F16H3/663 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, NL, SE [1996/04] | Title | German: | Mehrgang-Antriebsnabe mit mehr als 3 Gängen für ein Fahrrad | [1996/04] | English: | Multi-speed hub transmission for a bicycle with more than three speeds | [1996/04] | French: | Transmission de bicyclette à plusieurs vitesses avec plus de trois vitesses | [1996/04] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/47: (deleted) | EPB 1997/47: (deleted) | EPB 1997/47: (deleted) | EPB 1997/07: Teilanmeldung 96118842.2 eingereicht am 25/11/96 | EPB 1997/07: Divisional application 96118842.2 filed on 25/11/96 | EPB 1997/07: Demande divisionnaire 96118842.2 déposée le 25/11/96 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 07.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96118842.2 / EP0763461 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3934493 (HILLYER ANTHONY WILLIAM) [X] 1 * column A; figures 5,6 * [A] 2-12; | [A]GB2014260 (RALEIGH IND LTD T I) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0383350 (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * column A; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5064035 (TSUCHIE KIMIHIRO [JP]) [A] 13,14* column W *; | [XA]GB2251276 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,10,11 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-9,13; | [A]EP0531608 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0549570 (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,13 * column A * |