EP0682093 - Use of carbonate-containing, mineral fillers as gloss-reducing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/46] | Carbonate-containing, mineral fillers, especially for use as gloss-reducing agent | ||
[1998/30] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plüss-Staufer AG 4665 Oftringen / CH | [1999/27] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states Plüss-Staufer AG CH-4665 Oftringen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfaller, Harald, Dr. Landackerstrasse 32 CH-4612 Wangen bei Olten / CH | 02 /
Strauch, Dieter Kanalweg 24 CH-4800 Zofingen AG / CH | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105396.6 | 10.04.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | DE19944416895 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4416895 | [1995/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682093 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682093 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/00, C08K3/26 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
C01F11/185 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
C09C1/021 (EP,US);
C09D7/42 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/46] | Title | German: | Verwendung von carbonathaltigen mineralischen Füllstoffen als Mattierungsmittel | [1998/30] | English: | Use of carbonate-containing, mineral fillers as gloss-reducing agent | [1998/30] | French: | Utilisation des charges minérales contentant des carbonates comme agent de metité | [1998/30] |
Former [1995/46] | Carbonathaltige mineralische Füllstoffe, insbesondere zur Verwendung als Mattierungsmittel | ||
Former [1995/46] | Carbonate-containing, mineral fillers, especially for use as gloss-reducing agent | ||
Former [1995/46] | Charges minérales contenant des carbonates, spécialement pour l'utilisation comme agent de matité | Examination procedure | 16.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2000
08.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Naintsch Mineralwerke Gesellschaft m.b.H Stattegger Strasse 60 A-8045 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Atzwanger, Richard Patentanwalt Nothartgasse 16 1130 Wien / AT | 02
04.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Calcitwerk Schön + Hippelein GmbH+Co.KG D-74589 Satteldorf / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Ulrich, et al, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 03
06.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Imerys Minerals ltd. John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB Opponent's representative McCormack, Derek James Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | 04
07.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE S.A. Reverté Productos Minerales Ctra. Nacional 340, km 1196.6 ES-43719 Bellvei (Tarragona) / ES Opponent's representative Ungria López, Javier, et al, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A. Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2000
08.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Naintsch Mineralwerke Gesellschaft m.b.H Stattegger Strasse 60 A-8045 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Atzwanger, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Strasse 1c 1060 Wien / AT | ||
02
04.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Calcitwerk Schön + Hippelein GmbH+Co.KG D-74589 Satteldorf / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Ulrich, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03
06.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Imerys Minerals ltd. John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB Opponent's representative McCormack, Derek James Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | |||
04
07.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE S.A. Reverté Productos Minerales Ctra. Nacional 340, km 1196.6 ES-43719 Bellvei (Tarragona) / ES Opponent's representative Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A., Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | |||
Former [2000/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2000
08.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Naintsch Mineralwerke Gesellschaft m.b.H Stattegger Strasse 60 A-8045 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Atzwanger, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Strasse 1c 1060 Wien / AT | ||
02
04.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Calcitwerk Schön + Hippelein GmbH+Co.KG D-74589 Satteldorf / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Ulrich, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03
06.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Imerys Minerals ltd. John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB Opponent's representative McCormack, Derek James Imerys Minerals Limited, Intellectual Property Department, John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB | |||
04
07.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE S.A. Reverté Productos Minerales Ctra. Nacional 340, km 1196.6 ES-43719 Bellvei (Tarragona) / ES Opponent's representative Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A., Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | |||
Former [2000/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2000
18.07.2000
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED Naintsch Mineralwerke Gesellschaft m.b.H Stattegger Strasse 60 A-8045 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Atzwanger, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Strasse 1c 1060 Wien / AT | ||
02
04.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Calcitwerk Schön + Hippelein GmbH+Co.KG D-74589 Satteldorf / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Ulrich, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03
06.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Imerys Minerals ltd. John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB Opponent's representative McCormack, Derek James Imerys Minerals Limited, Intellectual Property Department, John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB | |||
04
07.04.2000
18.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE S.A. Reverté Productos Minerales Ctra. Nacional 340, km 1196.6 ES-43719 Bellvei (Tarragona) / ES Opponent's representative Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A., Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | |||
Former [2000/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2000
Naintsch Mineralwerke Gesellschaft m.b.H Stattegger Strasse 60 A-8045 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Atzwanger, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Strasse 1c 1060 Wien / AT | ||
02
04.04.2000
Calcitwerk Schön + Hippelein GmbH+Co.KG D-74589 Satteldorf / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Ulrich, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03
06.04.2000
Imerys Minerals ltd. John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB Opponent's representative McCormack, Derek James Imerys Minerals Limited, Intellectual Property Department, John Keay House St Austell, Cornwall PL25 4DJ / GB | |||
04
07.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE S.A. Reverté Productos Minerales Ctra. Nacional 340, km 1196.6 ES-43719 Bellvei (Tarragona) / ES Opponent's representative Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A., Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | |||
Former [2000/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2000
ADMISSIBLE Naintsch Mineralwerke Gesellschaft m.b.H Stattegger Strasse 60 A-8045 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Atzwanger, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Strasse 1c 1060 Wien / AT | ||
02
04.04.2000
Calcitwerk Schön + Hippelein GmbH+Co.KG D-74589 Satteldorf / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Ulrich, et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 29.09.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.04.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.04.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2187866 (ICI LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 30; example -; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US4170658 (MOON EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 7; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0012578 (MONSANTO EUROPE SA [BE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 23; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0217626 (DSG SCHRUMPFSCHLAUCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 23 - page 3, line 13; examples 2,A-N; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4835195 (RAYFIELD JERRY W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 5, line 34; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0515757 (KOWA CHEM IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1* page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 53; claims 1,3 * |