EP0677755 - Dichroic mirror for separating/synthesizing light with a plurality of wavelengths and optical apparatus and detecting method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyou-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | ||
Former [1995/42] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiyomoto, Hironobu, c/o Omron Corporation 10, Hanazono Tsuchidou-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Ekawa, Kouichi, c/o Omron Corporation 10, Hanazono Tsuchidou-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Hosakawa, Hayami, c/o Omron Corporation 10, Hanazono Tsuchidou-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95105664.7 | 13.04.1995 | [1995/42] | Priority number, date | JP19940102124 | 14.04.1994 Original published format: JP 10212494 | JP19940102126 | 14.04.1994 Original published format: JP 10212694 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0677755 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0677755 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677755 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/28 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
G02B6/29361 (EP,US);
G02B26/00 (KR);
G02B27/1006 (EP,US);
G02B27/104 (EP,US);
G02B27/1086 (EP,US);
G02B27/141 (EP,US);
G02B27/142 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US);
G02B5/0833 (EP,US);
G02B5/22 (EP,US);
G02B5/281 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
H04J14/0201 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/42] | Title | German: | Dichroitischer Spiegel zum Trennen/Zusammensetzen von aus mehreren Wellenlängen bestehendem Licht und optische Vorrichtung und Nachweismethode mit diesen Spiegel | [1995/42] | English: | Dichroic mirror for separating/synthesizing light with a plurality of wavelengths and optical apparatus and detecting method using the same | [1995/42] | French: | Miroir dichroique pour séparer/synthétiser de la lumière composée de plusieurs longueurs d'ondes et dispositif optique et procédé de détection utilisant ce miroir | [1995/42] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4320936 (SAWAMURA MITSUHARU) [X] 3,4,8,11,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - line 60 * * column 3, line 50 - line 55 * [A] 12-16,25-30; | [A]US4009453 (MAHLEIN HANS) [A] 1,3,6,8,11,20,25-30 * page 8; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4047805 (SEKIMURA NOBUYUKI) [A] 1,3,6,8,11,20 * abstract * | [A] - G.P.KONYUKHOV, E.A.NESMELOV, R.B.TAGIROV, "narrowband filter for a convergent radiation beam", OPTICS AND SPECTROSCOPY, NEW YORK, USA, vol. 55, no. 4, pages 452 - 453 [A] 1,3,6,8,11,20 * the whole document * |