EP0678561 - Metal pigments twice passivated in a gaseous phase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Raimund, Dr. Im Falkenhorst 1 D-67435 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Mronga, Norbert, Dr. Ringstr. 2 D-69221 Dossenheim / DE | 03 /
Keller, Harald, Dr. Dammstueckerweg 29 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Gomez, Juan Antonio Gonzalez, Dr. Schwalbenweg 37 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1995/43] | Application number, filing date | 95105711.6 | 15.04.1995 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | DE19944414079 | 22.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4414079 | [1995/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0678561 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0678561 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/62, C09C3/12, C09D7/12, C09C1/64, C09C1/66 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
C09C1/62 (EP,US);
C09C3/006 (EP,US);
C09C3/06 (EP,US);
C09C3/063 (EP,US);
C09D5/38 (EP,US);
C01P2004/88 (US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/43] | C09C1/62, C09C3/12, C09D7/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/43] | Title | German: | Zweifach gasphasenpassivierte Metallpigmente | [1995/43] | English: | Metal pigments twice passivated in a gaseous phase | [1995/43] | French: | Pigments métalliques doublement passivés en phase gazeuse | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/18] | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6356566 ; | [A]JPS6343964 ; | [A]JPS564629B ; | [A]EP0581235 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]) [A] 1,4 * claim 1 *; | [PA]EP0595131 (BASF AG [DE]) [PA] 1,4,6-8,10 * claims 1,3,5,7 *; | [D]DE4236332 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880729), vol. 12, no. 275, Database accession no. (C - 516), & JP63056566 A 19880311 (TOYO ALUM.) [A] 1-3,6,10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 14, Database accession no. 88-094531, XP002065944 & JPS6343964 A 19880225 (DAIHACHI CHEM. IND. CO.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 09, Database accession no. 81-14914d, XP002065945 & JPS564629B B2 19810113 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP.) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |