EP0738663 - Closure cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AptarGroup S.A. 147, rue du Président Roosevelt F-78100 Saint Germain en Laye / FR | [1996/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenthal, Karl-Heinz Eckenhagener Strasse 2 D-51580 Reichshof-Oberagger / DE | 02 /
Norbert, Filip Talstrasse 5 D-51674 Wiehl / DE | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Groening, Hans Wilhelm, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Groening, Hans Wilhelm, et al BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/06] | Groening, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing., et al BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/43] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106019.3 | 21.04.1995 | [1996/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738663 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738663 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/04 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
B65D41/0471 (EP);
B65D41/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1996/43] | Title | German: | Verschlusskappe | [1996/43] | English: | Closure cap | [1996/43] | French: | Capuchon de fermeture | [1996/43] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1995 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2329529 (ETABLISSEMENTS GIRAUD-GALLAIRE) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 8 - line 22; figure - * [A] 4; | [A]US4125201 (BIRCH) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]FR1399727 (ETABLISSEMENTS J.P.GRUSSEN) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 7 - line 28 * * page 1, column R, line 15 - line 20; figure . *; | [E]DE4340229 (INNOCOS INNOVATIVE VERPACKUNGE) [E] 1-7 * the whole document * |