EP0680727 - Analysing system for monitoring the concentration of an analyte in the blood of a patient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böcker, Dirk, Dr.Dr. Kirchstrasse 14 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Haar, Hans-Peter, Dr. Waldstrasse 2 D-69168 Wiesloch / DE | 03 /
Blasberg, Peter Blütenweg 7 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | 04 /
Kotulla, Reinhard, Dr. Schmiedtor 7 D-67245 Lambsheim / DE | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter Patentanwälte Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, Dr.rer.nat. Patentanwalt Nowackanlage 15 D-76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106046.6 | 22.04.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | DE19944415896 | 05.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4415896 | [1995/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680727 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680727 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
A61B5/6822 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (KR);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0295 (EP,US);
Y10S128/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | Analysesystem zur Überwachung der Konzentration eines Analyten im Blut eines Patienten | [1995/45] | English: | Analysing system for monitoring the concentration of an analyte in the blood of a patient | [1995/45] | French: | Sytème d'analyse pour surveiller la concentration d'un analyte dans le sang d'un patient | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 03.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4140963 (RAO RAGHAVENDRA, et al) [A] 1,7* column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 7; tables 1-3 *; | [XA]WO9200513 (FUTREX INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 2 * * page 40, line 26 - page 54, line 33; tables 21,26-29 * [A] 4,7-9,11; | [DA]EP0492326 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,9 * column 5, line 49 - column 9, line 21; tables 1-5 *; | [A]WO9222804 (FUTREX INC [US]) [A] 1-3,6,8,10 * page 6, line 28 - page 12, line 22; tables 1-5 * |