EP0679878 - Microsystem with integrated circuit and micromechanical component and fabrication procedure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zettler, Thomas, Dr. Sebastian-Bauer-Str. 35 D-81737 München / DE | [1995/44] | Application number, filing date | 95106099.5 | 24.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | DE19944414968 | 28.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4414968 | [1995/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0679878 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0679878 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0679878 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/14, G01P15/125, H02N1/00, H01H1/00 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
B81C1/00246 (EP,US);
G01L1/148 (EP,US);
G01P15/0802 (EP,US);
H01H1/0036 (EP,US);
H02N1/002 (EP,US);
B81C2203/0735 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [1995/44] | Title | German: | Mikrosystem mit integrierter Schaltung und mikromechanischem Bauteil und Herstellverfahren | [1995/44] | English: | Microsystem with integrated circuit and micromechanical component and fabrication procedure | [1995/44] | French: | Microsystème avec circuit intégré et composante micromécanique et procédé de fabrication | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9325915 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 31, paragraph 1 * * page 35, paragraph 2 *; | [A] - HACKETT R H ET AL, "The integration of micro-machine fabrication with electronic device fabrication on III-V semiconductor materials", TRANSDUCERS '91. 1991 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTUATORS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS (CAT. NO.91CH2817-5), SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 24-27 JUNE 1991, ISBN 0-87942-585-7, 1991, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 51 - 54, XP000647175 [A] 1 * page 51, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SENSOR.1991.148797 |