EP0682415 - Punctured convolutional encoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [1998/41] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states NextLevel Systems, Inc. 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | ||
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION OF DELAWARE 181 West Madison Street Chicago, Illinois 60602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
How, Stephen K. 6575 Lipmann Street San Diego, California 92122 / US | 02 /
Heegard, Chris 4 Woodland Road, RD No. 2 Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106120.9 | 24.04.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | US19940240232 | 10.05.1994 Original published format: US 240232 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682415 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682415 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/12 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
H04L1/0069 (EP,US);
H03M13/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | Codiereinrichtung für punktierten Faltungscode | [1995/46] | English: | Punctured convolutional encoder | [1995/46] | French: | Codeur pour code convolutif perforé | [1995/46] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/25] | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.1999 | BE | 08.12.1999 | CH | 08.12.1999 | GR | 08.12.1999 | IT | 08.12.1999 | LI | 08.12.1999 | NL | 08.12.1999 | SE | 08.12.1999 | DK | 08.03.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 08.12.1999 | |
BE | 08.12.1999 | ||
CH | 08.12.1999 | ||
GR | 08.12.1999 | ||
LI | 08.12.1999 | ||
NL | 08.12.1999 | ||
SE | 08.12.1999 | ||
DK | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 08.12.1999 | |
BE | 08.12.1999 | ||
CH | 08.12.1999 | ||
LI | 08.12.1999 | ||
NL | 08.12.1999 | ||
SE | 08.12.1999 | ||
DK | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 08.12.1999 | |
BE | 08.12.1999 | ||
CH | 08.12.1999 | ||
LI | 08.12.1999 | ||
NL | 08.12.1999 | ||
SE | 08.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 08.12.1999 | |
BE | 08.12.1999 | ||
CH | 08.12.1999 | ||
LI | 08.12.1999 | ||
SE | 08.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 08.12.1999 | |
BE | 08.12.1999 | ||
CH | 08.12.1999 | ||
LI | 08.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 08.12.1999 | |
BE | 08.12.1999 | ||
CH | 13.03.2000 | ||
LI | 13.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 08.12.1999 | |
CH | 13.03.2000 | ||
LI | 13.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 08.12.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6423625 ; | [A]JPH05183449 ; | [A]US5029331 (HEICHLER JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 1-6; | [DA] - Y. YASUDA et al., "High-Rate Punctured Convolutional Codes for Soft Decision Viterbi Decoding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (198403), vol. COM-32, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/TCOM.1984.1096047, pages 315 - 319, XP000758563 [DA] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1984.1096047 | [DA] - K.J. HOLE, "New Short Constraint Length Rate (N-1)/N Punctured Convolutional Codes for Soft-Decision Viterbi Decoding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (198801), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 1079 - 1081 [DA] 1-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, E field, vol. 13, no. 207, May 16, 1989 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 4 E 758; & JP-A-01 023 625 (FUJITSU) [A] 1-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, E field, vol. 17, no. 599, November 02, 1993 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 167 E 1455; & JP-A-05 183 449 (HITACHI DENSHI) [A] 1-6 | by applicant | - Y. YASUDA; K. KASHIKI; Y. HIRATA, "High-Rate Punctured Convolutional Codes for Soft Decision Viterbi Decoding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (198403), vol. COM-32, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/TCOM.1984.1096047, pages 315 - 318, XP000758563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1984.1096047 | - K. J. HOLE, "New Short Constraint Length Rate (N-1)/N Punctured Convolutional Codes for Soft-Decision Viterbi Decoding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (198809), vol. IT-34, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/18.21236, pages 1079 - 1081, XP000007615 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.21236 | - G. D. FORNEY, JR., "Convolutional Codes I: Algebraic Structure", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (197011), vol. IT-16, doi:doi:10.1109/TIT.1970.1054541, pages 720 - 738, XP000577350 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1970.1054541 | - K. J. HOLE, "New Short Constraint Length Rate (n-l)/n Punctured Convolutional Codes for Soft-Decision Viterbi Decoding", IEEE TRANS. ON INFO. THEORY, (198809), vol. IT-34, doi:doi:10.1109/18.21236, pages 1079 - 1081, XP000007615 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.21236 | US19930054642 |