EP0680239 - Connection control equipment for ISDN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uota, Toshihiro 2-4-15-201 Hinode Funabashi-shi, Chiba / JP | 02 /
Nakabayashi, Jiro 1-15-1-606 Tajima Urawa-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Iwano, Tsuneaki 3-35-1-1205 Hamadayama Suginami-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Nakano, Hirotaka 5-10-1-5-203 Kichijyoujikita-machi Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Nakamura, Osamu 5-2-12-307 Misugidai Hanno-shi, Saitama / JP | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/44] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106134.0 | 24.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | JP19940091782 | 28.04.1994 Original published format: JP 9178294 | [1995/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0680239 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0680239 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680239 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04M3/50 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0457 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/44] | H04Q11/04, H04M11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/44] | Title | German: | Verbindungssteuervorrichtung für ISDN | [1995/44] | English: | Connection control equipment for ISDN | [1995/44] | French: | Dispositif de commande de connection pour RNIS | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 21.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5138466 (SAITO HIROHISA [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 48 * * claim 1 *; | [XA]FR2690027 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 12 * * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 14 * * page 11, line 11 - page 14, line 4 * * claims 1,3-6 * * figures 3-7 * * page 12, line 5 - page 12, line 16; figure 3; claim 3 * [A] 4; | [A]US5278665 (SAWADA MITSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 55 * * claims 1-8 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5297146 (OGAWA FUKUSHIGE [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 18 ** claims 17-20 * |