EP0680016 - System and method for compressing images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dujari, Rajeev 65 Kirkland Avenue, No. 305 Kirkland, Washington 98033 / US | [1995/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106135.7 | 24.04.1995 | [1995/44] | Priority number, date | US19940232624 | 25.04.1994 Original published format: US 232624 | [1995/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0680016 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0680016 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680016 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00 | [1995/44] | CPC: |
G06T9/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/44] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bildkompression | [1995/44] | English: | System and method for compressing images | [1995/44] | French: | Système et méthode pour la compression d'images | [1995/44] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 13.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01277976 ; | [Y]GB2245463 (RANK CINTEL LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-18 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 6; claims 23-27 *; | [X]JPS6055475 ; | [X]EP0552791 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,11-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3804975 (ABE T); | [A]JPH01243188 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900130), vol. 014, no. 050, Database accession no. (P - 0998), & JP01277976 A 19891108 (MEIDENSHA CORP) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850802), vol. 009, no. 186, Database accession no. (P - 377), & JP60055475 A 19850330 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1-4,6,11-15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891221), vol. 013, no. 580, Database accession no. (P - 980), & JP01243188 A 19890927 (MEIDENSHA CORP) [A] * abstract * | Examination | - HARALICK R.M., SHAPIRO L.G.: "Computer and Robot Vision, Vol. I", 1992, ADDISON WESLEY |