EP0682036 - Process for the preparation of mono- and dimethylmetallocenes and their solutions especially for the use in the polymerisation of olefines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Witco GmbH Ernst-Schering-Strasse 14 59192 Bergkamen / DE | [2000/32] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states Witco GmbH Ernst-Schering-Strasse 14 D-59192 Bergkamen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lisowsky, Richard, Dr. Breslauer Strasse 9 D-59174 Kamen / DE | [1995/46] | Application number, filing date | 95106258.7 | 26.04.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | DE19944416894 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4416894 | [1995/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0682036 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0682036 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682036 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Synthese von Mono- und Dimethylmetallocenen und deren Lösungen speziell für den Einsatz zur Polymerisation von Olefinen | [1995/46] | English: | Process for the preparation of mono- and dimethylmetallocenes and their solutions especially for the use in the polymerisation of olefines | [1995/46] | French: | Procédé de préparation de mono- et diméthylmétallocènes et leur utilisation spécifiquement pour la polymérisation d'oléfines | [1995/46] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/08] | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2209166 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1* claims 1,11 * |