EP0683517 - Semiconductor device having semiconductor chip bonded to circuit board through bumps and process of mounting thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urushima, Michitaka c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106499.7 | 28.04.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | JP19940094881 | 09.05.1994 Original published format: JP 9488194 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0683517 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0683517 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683517 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/31, H01L23/495 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L23/3128 (EP,US);
H01L23/3185 (EP,US);
H01L23/49572 (EP,US);
H01L23/49816 (EP,US);
H01L24/50 (EP,US);
H01L24/86 (EP,US);
H05K3/3436 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10681 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/47] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung bestehend aus einem Halbleiterchip, der mittels Kontakthöckern auf der Leiterplatte verbunden ist und Montageverfahren | [1995/47] | English: | Semiconductor device having semiconductor chip bonded to circuit board through bumps and process of mounting thereof | [1995/47] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur ayant une puce semi-conductrice connectée avec une plaque de circuit par des plots de contact et procédé de montage | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6482646 ; | [YA]JPH05259221 ; | [X]JPH02252248 ; | [YA]US5216278 (LIN PAUL T [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,13 * column 6, line 11 - line 68; figures 6,7B * [A] 1; | [YA]JPH0467658 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890713), vol. 013, no. 307, Database accession no. (E - 787), & JP01082646 A 19890328 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2-7,13-15 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940113), vol. 018, no. 020, Database accession no. (E - 1489), & JP05259221 A 19931008 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [Y] 2,13 * the whole document * [A] 1,12 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901225), vol. 014, no. 580, Database accession no. (E - 1017), & JP02252248 A 19901011 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,2,8,9,11 * the whole document * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920619), vol. 016, no. 275, Database accession no. (E - 1219), & JP04067658 A 19920303 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 3,4,14,15 * abstract * [A] 6,7 |