EP0681170 - Method and device for compensating an imbalance of a vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snap-on Equipment GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 2 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Snap-On Equipment GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 2 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Snap-On Deutschland Holding GmbH Auf dem Hüls 5 40822 Mettmann / DE | ||
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states HOFMANN WERKSTATT-TECHNIK GMBH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 2 D-64319 Pfungstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rothamel, Karl Heidelberger Strasse 49 D-64342 Seeheim / DE | 02 /
Diez, Ulrich Mennkausener Strasse 5 D-51580 Reichshof / DE | 03 /
Humber, Kurt Schlussgasse 8 D-64347 Griesheim / DE | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Nöth, Heinz, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwalt, Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/45] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Mozartstrasse 17 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106735.4 | 04.05.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | DE19944415931 | 05.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4415931 | [1995/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0681170 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0681170 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681170 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/32 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
G01M1/326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausgleich einer Unwucht an einem Kraftfahrzeugrad | [1995/45] | English: | Method and device for compensating an imbalance of a vehicle wheel | [1995/45] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour compenser un déséquilibre d'une roue de véhicule | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 07.05.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1997
19.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE HAWEKA Werkstatt-Technik GmbH Kokenhorststrasse 4 30938 Burgwedel / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | 02
09.10.1997
24.10.1997
WITHDRAWN Snap-on Equipment Europe Limited Shannon, County Clare / IE Opponent's representative Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1997
19.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE HAWEKA Werkstatt-Technik GmbH Kokenhorststrasse 4 30938 Burgwedel / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
02
09.10.1997
24.10.1997
WITHDRAWN Snap-on Equipment Europe Limited Shannon, County Clare / IE Opponent's representative Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | |||
Former [1997/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1997
HAWEKA Werkstatt-Technik GmbH Kokenhorststrasse 4 30938 Burgwedel / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
02
09.10.1997
WITHDRAWN Snap-on Equipment Europe Limited Shannon, County Clare / IE Opponent's representative Gorman, Francis Fergus F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | |||
Former [1997/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE HAWEKA Werkstatt-Technik GmbH Kokenhorststrasse 4 30938 Burgwedel / DE Opponent's representative Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | 25.11.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.03.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.08.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.01.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/18] | Appeal following opposition | 05.10.1999 | Appeal received No. T0953/99 | 22.12.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 28.01.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2003 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05281076 ; | [AD]DE2019649 (ENDL GMBH & CO ELEKTRONIK) [AD] 1-4* claims 1-6 *; | [AD]DE2522149 (PLANET METALL GMBH) [AD] 1-4 * claims 1-23 *; | [A]US4759217 (BRIHIER GERARD C [FR], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 2 - column 5 *; | [A]US4854168 (HIMMLER GUNTHER [DE]) [A] 1,5 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]US4926341 (GUYOT VOLKER [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 5 - column 7 *; | [A]EP0417414 (HOFMANN GMBH & CO KG MASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1,5 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0454393 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [AP]US5355729 (DOUGLAS MICHAEL W [US]) [AP] 1,5 * claims 1-11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940202), vol. 18, no. 64, Database accession no. (P - 1685), & JP5281076 A 19931029 (KOKUSAI KEISOKKI KK) [A] 5 * abstract * |