EP0685203 - Self-contained powered surgical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mililli, Carlo A. 30 Maler Avenue Huntington, CT 06484 / US | 02 /
Young, Wayne P. Allview Avenue Brewster, NY 10509 / US | 03 /
DeFonzo, Stephan A. 39 Plateau Avenue Bridgeport, CT 06606 / US | 04 /
Mastri, Dominick L. 302 Cambridge Street Bridgeport, CT 06606 / US | 05 /
Bolanos, Henry 9 Tonetta Circle East Norwalk, CT 06855 / US | 06 /
Stern, Leonard 37 Olson Drive Southington, CT 06489 / US | [1996/07] |
Former [1995/49] | 01 /
Mililli, Carlo A. 30 Maler Avenue Huntington, CT 06484 / US | ||
02 /
Young, Wayne P. Allview Avenue Brewster, NY 10509 / US | |||
03 /
DeFonzo, Stephan A. 39 Plateau Avenue Bridgeport, CT 06606 / US | |||
04 /
Mastri, Diminick L. 302 Cambridge Street Bridgeport, CT 06606 / US | |||
05 /
Bolanos, Henry 9 Tonetta Circle East Norwalk, CT 06855 / US | |||
06 /
Stern, Leonard 37 Olson Drive Southington, CT 06489 / US | Representative(s) | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106819.6 | 05.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | US19940238770 | 05.05.1994 Original published format: US 238770 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0685203 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0685203 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/068 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/0684 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/49] | Title | German: | Unabhängige, angetriebene, chirurgische Vorrichtung | [1995/49] | English: | Self-contained powered surgical apparatus | [1995/49] | French: | Dispositif motorisé et autonome de chirurgie | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 10.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2905178 (HILZINGER III PAUL) [A] 10,12 * column 3, line 55 - line 61; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3618842 (BRYAN GRAHAM W) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [DYA]US3815476 (GREEN D, et al) [DY] 1-3,9 * abstract * [A] 4; | [A]EP0041022 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 10,11,13,14 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US4867158 (SUGG WINFRED L [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO8910094 (INNOVATIVE SURGICAL DEVICES IN [US]) [A] 10,12 * abstract *; | [X]EP0399701 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 10 * figure 17 *; | [A]EP0536903 (ETHICON INC [US]); | [DYA]EP0552050 (ETHICON INC [US]) [DY] 1-3,9 * column 8, paragraph 2; figures 3,6-11 * [A] 5; | [X]EP0552423 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 10,11,13,14 * abstract *; | [DA]US5289963 (MCGARRY RICHARD A [US], et al) [DA] 1,9 * column 10, paragraph 3 * |