EP0685574 - Process for the preparation of the coating process of reactivatable electrodes for electrolytic applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/49] | Process for the preparation of the coating process of activable or reactivable electrodes for electrolytic applications | ||
[1998/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Elektrochemie GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | [1995/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dehm, Gerhard Schillerstrasse 21 D-63579 Freigericht / DE | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/50] |
Former [1995/49] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 95106891.5 | 06.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | DE19944419276 | 01.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4419276 | [1995/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0685574 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0685574 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685574 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/00 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
C23C4/02 (EP);
C25B11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, IT [1995/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vorbereitung des Beschichtungsprozesses von reaktivierbaren Elektroden für elektrolytische Zwecke | [1998/27] | English: | Process for the preparation of the coating process of reactivatable electrodes for electrolytic applications | [1998/27] | French: | Procédé de traitement préliminaire au processus de revêtement d'électrodes réactivables utilisées en électrolyse | [1998/27] |
Former [1995/49] | Verfahren zur Vorbereitung des Beschichtungsprozesses von aktivierbaren oder reaktivierbaren Elektroden für elektrolytische Zwecke | ||
Former [1995/49] | Process for the preparation of the coating process of activable or reactivable electrodes for electrolytic applications | ||
Former [1995/49] | Procédé de traitement préliminaire au processus de revêtement d'électrodes activables ou réactivables utilisées en électrolyse | Examination procedure | 22.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 13.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5118937 ; | [Y]EP0568315 (PROGRESSIVE BLASTING SYSTEMS I [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 12 * * column 6, line 6 - line 15 * * claims 1-11 *; | [Y]EP0576402 (ELTECH SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 12 * * page 5, line 22 - line 41 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 76, no. 13, Database accession no. 76-23653X, & JPS5118937 A 19760214 (KOBE STEEL KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | DE4032862 |