EP0683619 - Method and apparatus for the diversion of a communication cell stream to an alternative path [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edmaier, Bernhard, Dipl. Ing. Grundberg 6 D-82229 Seefeld / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Wolfgang, Dr. Ing. Erikastrasse 18 D D-82110 Germering / DE | [1995/47] | Application number, filing date | 95106942.6 | 08.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | DE19944416718 | 11.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4416718 | [1995/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0683619 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0683619 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
H04L45/10 (EP,US);
H04B1/74 (EP,US);
H04J3/0632 (EP,US);
H04L1/22 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Umleiten eines Nachrichtenzellenstromes auf einen Ersatzweg | [1995/47] | English: | Method and apparatus for the diversion of a communication cell stream to an alternative path | [1995/47] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la déviation d'un courant de cellules de communication sur une voie alternative | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/33] | 30.03.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0566241 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * claims 1,2,12,14 * [Y] 8,9,12-14; | [PX]US5315581 (NAKANO YUKIO [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2,10,11 * Family-member: JP0498917, published 24.5.1994, possible X-document.; page 2, column L, line 46 - page 3, column L, line 36 ** page 4, column L, line 6 - line 14; claim 12 *; | [DY] - HIROSHI OHTA ET AL, "HITLESS LINE PROTECTION SWITCHING METHOD FOR ATM NETWORKS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), GENEVA, MAY 23 - 26, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930523), VOL. 1, no. -, pages 272 - 276, XP000371105 [DY] 8,9,12-14 * page 273, column L, line 10 - column R, line 5 * |