EP0685280 - Method for the continuous casting of high-carbon steels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meroni, Umberto Via Bariglaria 248 I-33100 Udine / IT | 02 /
Carboni, Andrea Via Vodice 13 I-20148 Milano / IT | 03 /
Ruzza, Domenico Wogler Viale Ungheria 63 I-33100 Udine / IT | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 95107117.4 | 11.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | IT1994UD00091 | 30.05.1994 Original published format: IT UD940091 | [1995/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685280 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/04, B22D11/22, B22D11/07 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
B22D11/22 (EP,US);
B22D11/0406 (KR);
B22D11/0408 (EP,US);
B22D11/07 (EP,US);
B22D11/161 (EP,US);
B22D11/166 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Giessen von Stahl mit hohem Kohlenstoffgehalt | [1995/49] | English: | Method for the continuous casting of high-carbon steels | [1995/49] | French: | Procédé de coulée continue d'acier à teneur élevée en carbone | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/43] | 03.06.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04127948 ; | [A]DE3427756 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * claim - *; | [A]EP0498296 (CONCAST STANDARD AG [CH]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 42 - column 5, line 56 * | [A] - R.B. MAHAPATRA ET AL., Mold Behavior and Its Influence on Quality in the Continuous Casting of Steel Slaps: Part I, WARRENDALE, PA, US, METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS B, 22B (1991) DECEMBER, NO 6, PAGE 861-874 [A] 1 * page 866, Table II, Table III * | [A] - R.B. MAHAPATRA ET AL., Mold Behavior and Its Influence on Quality in the Continuous Casting of Steel Slaps: Part II, WARRENDALE, PA, US, METALLURGICAL TRANSACTIONS B, 22B (1991) DECEMBER, NO. 6, PAGE 875-888 [A] 1 * page 883, column R, paragraph 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920818), vol. 16, no. 388, Database accession no. (M - 1297), & JP04127948 A 19920428 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 5 * abstract * |