EP0689178 - Device for receiving signals transmitted by moving objects in a predetermined region [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/28] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH Gerberstrasse 33 D-71522 Backnang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göckler, Heinz, Dr. Ing. Elbinger Strasse 52 D-71522 Backnang / DE | 02 /
Gebauer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Albrecht Bengel Strasse 1 D-71546 Aspach / DE | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1996/28] |
Former [1995/52] | Thier, Heinz, et al ANT Nachrichtentechnik GmbH, Patentabteilung, Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107445.9 | 17.05.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | DE19944421573 | 21.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4421573 | [1995/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689178 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/017, G07B15/00, G01S13/42 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
G07B15/063 (EP);
G01S3/143 (EP);
G08G1/017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Empfangen von Signalen, die in einem vorgegebenen Gebiet sich bewegende Objekte aussenden | [1995/52] | English: | Device for receiving signals transmitted by moving objects in a predetermined region | [1995/52] | French: | Dispositif pour la réception de signaux ermis pour des objets mobiles dans une région prédéterminée | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 14.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1999/51] | 06.08.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3909874 (TELEFUNKEN SYSTEMTECHNIK) [Y] 1-6 * page 4, line 26 - line 59 *; | [Y]EP0588045 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECHNIK GMBH) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4947176 (INATSUNE ET AL.) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4656479 (KIRIMOTO ET AL.) [A] 1-6 * claim - *; | [A]EP0578060 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECHNIK GMBH); | [A]WO9215978 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECHNIK GMBH) | by applicant | DE19924228658 |