EP0683004 - Apparatus for handling and positioning tools in a cutting press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [1998/47] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varidel, Charly Chemin de la Millière 3 CH-1052 Le Mont / CH | 02 /
Steiner, Jean-Pierre Chemin du Couchant 16 CH-1023 Crissier / CH | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Colomb, Claude BOBST S.A., Service des Brevets, Case Postale CH-1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 95107464.0 | 17.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | CH19940001585 | 20.05.1994 Original published format: CH 158594 | [1995/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683004 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683004 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23D35/00 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
B26D7/2614 (EP);
B23D35/008 (EP);
B26D7/00 (EP);
B26D2007/2607 (EP);
B26F1/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1995/47] | Title | German: | Wechselvorrichtung für die Werkzeuge einer Schneidvorrichtung | [1995/47] | English: | Apparatus for handling and positioning tools in a cutting press | [1995/47] | French: | Dispositif pour la manutention et le réglage des outils d'une presse à découper | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/47] | 23.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8601444 (BOBST SA [CH]) [A] 1 * EN ENTIER *; | [A]EP0458065 (BOBST SA [CH]) |