EP0685474 - Oxalylamino-benzofuran- and benzothienyl-derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/38] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bräunlich, Gabriele, Dr. Claudiusweg 9 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Rüdiger, Dr. Christian-Gau-Str. 33 D-50933 Köln / DE | 03 /
Es-Sayed, Mazen, Dr. Claudiusweg 3 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
Hanko, Rudolf, Dr. Schillerstr. 23 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
Tudhope, Stephen, Dr. 47 Kentons Lane Windsor Berkshire SL4 4JH / GB | 06 /
Sturton, Graham, Dr. 184 Windsor Road Bray Maidenhead SL 62 DW / GB | 07 /
Abram, Trevor, Dr. 214 Marlow Bottom Marlow Buckinghamshire / GB | 08 /
McDonald-Gibson, Wendy J., Dr. 2 Cottsmore Lane Exelme Wallingford, Oxford, OX106HD / GB | 09 /
Fitzgerald, Mary F., Dr. 11 Begbroke Lane Begbroke Oxford, OX51RN / GB | [1995/49] | Application number, filing date | 95107604.1 | 18.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | GB19940010891 | 31.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9410891 | GB19940010863 | 31.05.1994 Original published format: GB 9410863 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685474 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685474 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/80, C07D307/83, C07D417/12, C07D307/84, C07D333/56, C07D409/10, C07D405/10, C07D407/12, A61K31/34, A61K31/38, A61K31/44, A61K31/41, A61K31/535 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D307/80 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/83 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/84 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/49] | Extension states | LT | 22.05.1995 | SI | 22.05.1995 | Title | German: | Oxalylamino-Benzofuran- und Benzothienylderivate | [1995/49] | English: | Oxalylamino-benzofuran- and benzothienyl-derivatives | [1995/49] | French: | Dérivés de oxalylamino-benzofuranne et -benzothienyle | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/25] | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | SE311167 [ ] (AKTIEBOLAG HASSLE); | [DA]EP0146243 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]) [DA] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0551662 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [PA]EP0623607 (BAYER AG [DE]) [PA] 1-10* the whole document * | [A] - A.E. BRANDSTROM ET AL., "Pharmacologically active benzofuran derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19721204), vol. 77, no. 23, Database accession no. 151884g, page 395, column 2 [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0146243 | - IND. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 97, pages 194 - 199 |