EP0675196 - Mutated subtilisin genes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aaslyng, Dorrit Gartnerkrogen 69 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | 02 /
Hastrup, Sven Sankt Hansgade 1,2.TV. DK-2200 Kobenhavn N. / DK | 03 /
Branner, Sven Ved Smedebakken 7A DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | 04 /
Norris, Fanny Ahlmanns Allé 34 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | 05 /
Petersen, Steffen B. Sneppehoj 15 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | 06 /
Norskov-Lauridsen, Leif Strandvejen 80 DK-4733 Tappernoje / DK | 07 /
Jensen, Villy Johannes Skovkilden 6 DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [1995/45] |
Former [1995/40] | 01 /
Aaslyng, Dorrit Gartnerkrogen 69 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | ||
02 /
Hastrup, Sven Frederiksborgvej 10, 3.th DK-2400 Kobenhavn NV / DK | |||
03 /
Branner, Sven Ved Smedebakken 7A DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | |||
04 /
Norris, Fanny Ahlmanns Allé 34 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | |||
05 /
Petersen, Steffen B. Sneppehoj 15 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
06 /
Norskov-Lauridsen, Leif Strandvejen 80 DK-4733 Tappernoje / DK | |||
07 /
Jensen, Villy Johannes Skovkilden 6 DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/04] |
Former [2000/04] | Jensen, Bo Hammer, et al Novo Nordisk A/S, Enzyme Business Patents, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1995/40] | Jensen, Bo Hammer, et al Novo Nordisk A/S, Corporate Patents BoH, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 95107678.5 | 06.01.1989 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | DK19880000064 | 07.01.1988 Original published format: DK 6488 | [1995/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0675196 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0675196 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/50 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP,US);
C12N9/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/43] | C12N9/50, C12N15/57 | ||
Former IPC [1995/40] | C12N9/54, C11D3/386, C12N9/50, C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/40] | Title | German: | Mutierte Subtilisingene | [1995/40] | English: | Mutated subtilisin genes | [1995/40] | French: | Gènes de subtilisine mutés | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1996 | New documents discovered [N /P] | 22.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/17] | 24.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.12.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89901711.5 / EP0396608 | Divisional application(s) | EP04025116.7 / EP1498481 | EP05004172.2 / EP1538204 | Request for further processing for: | 18.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2005 | Decision despatched | 19.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8704461 (AMGEN [US])[X] 1-24; | [X]WO8705050 (GENEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-24 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [X] 1-24 | by applicant | US3723250 | US4760025 | - JOLIFFE ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1980), vol. 141, pages 1199 - 1208 | - WHITE, HANDLER, SMITH, Principles of Biochemistry, N.Y., MCGRAW-HILL BOOK COMPANY, (1973), pages 271 - 272 | - PRIEST, BACTERIOLOGICAL REV., (1977), vol. 41, pages 711 - 753 | - KURIHARA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1972), vol. 247, pages 5629 - 5631 | - STAHL, FERRARI, J. BACTERIOL., (1984), vol. 158, pages 411 - 418 | - VASANTHA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1984), vol. 159, pages 811 - 819 | - JACOBS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 8913 - 8926 | - NEDKOV ET AL., BIOL. CHEM. HOPPE-SEYLER, (1985), vol. 366, pages 421 - 430 | - SVENDSEN ET AL., FEBS LETT, (1986), vol. 196, pages 228 - 232 | - MELOUN ET AL., FEBS. LETT., (1985), vol. 183, pages 195 - 200 | - JANY, MAYER, BIOL. CHEM. HOPPE-SEYLER, (1985), vol. 366, pages 584 - 592 | - KRAUT, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1977), vol. 46, pages 331 - 358 | - WELLS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 1219 - 1223 | - WELLS ET AL., PHIL. TRANS. R. SOC. LOND. A., (1986), vol. 317, pages 415 - 423 | - HWANG, WARSHEL, BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 26, pages 2669 - 2673 | - RAO ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 328, pages 551 - 554 | - SPIZIZEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1958), vol. 44, pages 1072 - 1078 | - "Search and Align", M.A. DAYHOFF, National Biomedical Research Foundation, WASHINGTON, D.C., GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, (1976), vol. 5, page 3 FF. | - SHORTLE, NATHANS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 2170 - 2174 | - MYERS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 242 - 257 | - MORINAGA ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1984), vol. 2, pages 646 - 649 | - VILLA-KAMAROFF ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 3727 - 3731 | - DEBOER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - "Useful proteins from recombinant bacteria", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1980), vol. 242, pages 74 - 94 | - M.J. CASA-DABAN, S.N. COHEN, J. MOL. BIOL., (1980), vol. 138, pages 179 - 207 | - JAY C. HARRIS, Detergency Evaluation and Testing, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS LTD., (1954), pages 60 - 61 | - J. VIEIRA, J. MESSING, GENE, (1982), vol. 19, pages 259 - 268 | - VLASUK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 258, pages 7141 - 7148 | - G.P. VLASUK, S. INOUYE, G.P. VLASUK, S. INOUYE, M. INOUYE, Experimental Manipulation of Gene Expression, NEW YORK, ACADEMIC PRESS, pages 292 - 303 | US19870039298 | US19870067992 |