EP0686548 - Gear box structure in motor-assisted bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, 2-chome Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroki, Masahiro, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann,K. Fincke,F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber,H. Liska,J. Prechtel,B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/50] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107985.4 | 24.05.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | JP19940152721 | 11.06.1994 Original published format: JP 15272194 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0686548 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0686548 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686548 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B62M7/04, B62M23/02 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
B62M7/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/50] | B62M7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1995/50] | Title | German: | Struktur des Getriebegehäuses eines Fahrrads mit Hilfsmotor | [1995/50] | English: | Gear box structure in motor-assisted bicycle | [1995/50] | French: | Structure de boîte de vitesses d'une bicyclette avec moteur auxiliaire | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 05.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0168905 (GOLDENFELD ILIYA [IL], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 27; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2249529 (HSU CHI HSUEH, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH05238461 ; | [AD]JPH05319104 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931220), vol. 17, no. 697, Database accession no. (M - 1532), & JP05238461 A 19930917 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940307), vol. 18, no. 136, Database accession no. (M - 1572), & JP05319104 A 19931203 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH05319104 |