EP0684207 - Machine for forming padded strips, particularly to be used as perimetric bands in the manufacture of mattresses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESTA S.R.L. Via Morgagni, 33 I-48018 Faenza (Ravenna) / IT | [1995/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Resta, Roberto Via Ospitalacci 82 I-48018 Faenza (Ravenna) / IT | 02 /
Resta, Mario Via Cantagalli 27 I-48018 Faenza (Ravenna) / IT | 03 /
Resta, Rodolfo Via Salvemini 14 I-48018 Faenza(Ravenna) / IT | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95108007.6 | 24.05.1995 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | IT1994BO00251 | 27.05.1994 Original published format: IT BO940251 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0684207 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0684207 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B68G7/02, B68G7/04 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
B68G7/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/48] | B68G7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, PT [1995/48] | Title | German: | Maschine für die Herstellung von Polsterstreifen, insbesondere zur Verwendung als perimetrische Streifen für Matratzen | [1995/48] | English: | Machine for forming padded strips, particularly to be used as perimetric bands in the manufacture of mattresses | [1995/48] | French: | Machine pour fabriquer des bandes rembourrées, en particulier destinées à être utilisées comme bandes périmétriques pour les matelas | [1995/48] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 07.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/03] | 21.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.06.1997 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE890898 (EMIL STUTZNAECKER FA) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE933604 (LANGENSCHEIDT ERNST) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6; | [AY]GB884199 (JOA CURT G) [A] 1,7 * page 5, line 10 - line 21; figures 1,2 *[Y] 6 |