EP0694690 - Air suction device of v-type engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/05] | Air suction device for v-type engine | ||
[1998/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION 300, Takatsukacho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION 300, Takatsukacho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishio, Yasuaki, c/o Suzuki Motor Corporation 300, Takatsuka-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/05] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 D-80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108435.9 | 01.06.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | JP19940197509 | 30.07.1994 Original published format: JP 19750994 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694690 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694690 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/10 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
F02M35/10045 (EP,US);
F02B75/22 (EP,US);
F02M35/10078 (EP,US);
F02M35/116 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1824 (EP,US);
F02F7/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/05] | Title | German: | Luftansaugsystem einer Brennkraftmaschine in V-Bauart | [1998/05] | English: | Air suction device of v-type engine | [1998/05] | French: | Système d'admission d'air d'un moteur en V | [1998/05] |
Former [1996/05] | Luftansaugsystem für Brennkraftmaschine in V-Bauart | ||
Former [1996/05] | Air suction device for v-type engine | ||
Former [1996/05] | Système d'admission d'air pour moteur en V | Examination procedure | 01.06.1995 | Examination requested [1996/05] | 08.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5265568 (NAKAGAWA TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]EP0456225 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 19 - line 34 * * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 7; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3,5; | [XA]JPS6069239 ; | [XA]JPH05280351 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850827), vol. 9, no. 209, Database accession no. (M - 407), & JP60069239 A 19850419 (MAZDA KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,5 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940131), vol. 18, no. 59, Database accession no. (M - 1552), & JP05280351 A 19931026 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,5 | by applicant | JPH0259253 | JPH0650224 |