EP0688060 - Electrical antenna assembly and electrical device including same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GALTRONICS LTD. POB 1589 Tiberias 14115 / IL | [1995/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elliott, Michael POB 3 Poriya Illit 15208 / IL | 02 /
Martiskainen, Matti POB 44 Poriya Illit 15208 / IL | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108987.9 | 09.06.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | IL19940110008 | 13.06.1994 Original published format: IL 11000894 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688060 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688060 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
H01Q1/24 (EP,US);
H01Q1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/51] | Title | German: | Antennenanordnung und dieselbe enthaltende elektrische Vorrichtung | [1995/51] | English: | Electrical antenna assembly and electrical device including same | [1995/51] | French: | Agencement d'antenne et dispositif électrique comprenant une telle antenne | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 05.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2000 | BE | 08.03.2000 | CH | 08.03.2000 | ES | 08.03.2000 | GR | 08.03.2000 | LI | 08.03.2000 | NL | 08.03.2000 | PT | 08.06.2000 | IE | 09.06.2000 | LU | 09.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
GR | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
NL | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
IE | 09.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
NL | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
IE | 09.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
IE | 09.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
IE | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
IE | 09.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
PT | 08.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 08.03.2000 | |
LI | 08.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4170014 (SULLY GEORGE R [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP0467822 (GALTRONICS LTD [IL]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9216980 (DANCALL RADIO AS [DK]) [A] 1,7-9 * abstract * * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 2 * * page 9, line 6 - line 9 *; | [D]US5204687 (ELLIOTT MICHAEL [IL], et al) | by applicant | US5204687 |